LINK ETHIOPIA

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The advancement of education and the relief of poverty in Ethiopia through work with schools and young people in the UK and Ethiopia. We facilitate school links between British and Ethiopian schools. We support the development of schools in Ethiopia and run teacher exchange and volunteering programmes as well as sponsorship and teacher training projects.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
- Ethiopia
Governance
- 05 December 2005: Standard registration
- Together We Learn (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ASHLEY ENGLAND | Chair |
|
||||||
Matthew Stockdale | Trustee | 03 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Holly McKenzie | Trustee | 03 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
ELSABETH GEZAHEGN KING | Trustee | 09 March 2017 |
|
|||||
Jack Leonard Sharville | Trustee | 09 September 2015 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £390.36k | £317.30k | £277.56k | £78.61k | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £359.32k | £349.28k | £254.60k | £203.85k | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £30.96k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 18 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 31 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 30 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 29 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 29 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2019 | 31 January 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2019 | 31 January 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 18 SEPTEMBER 2005
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND THE RELIEF OF POVERTY IN ETHIOPIA AND THE PROMOTION OF RACIAL HARMONY BETWEEN THE YOUNG PEOPLE OF THE UNITED KINGDOM AND ETHIOPIA, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY: A. THE PROVISION OF TRAINING, INFORMATION, ADVICE AND ASSISTANCE TO INTERNATIONAL LINK PROGRAMMES BETWEEN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND ETHIOPIA; B. THE PROVISION OF FINANCIAL AND MATERIAL SUPPORT TO SCHOOLS, ORGANISATIONS, CHARITIES AND INDIVIDUALS IN ETHIOPIA; C. THE RAISING OF PUBLIC AWARENESS IN THE UNITED KINGDOM OF ETHIOPIA'S EDUCATIONAL, HEALTH AND CULTURAL ISSUES, PARTICULARLY IN SCHOOLS AND AMONG GROUPS OF YOUNG PEOPLE.
Area of benefit
ETHIOPIA
Contact information
- Address:
-
LINK ETHIOPIA
225-229 SEVEN SISTERS ROAD
LONDON
N4 2DA
- Phone:
- 02086173393
- Email:
- hello@linkethiopia.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window