Accounts and annual returns NEWCASTLE CENTRAL MOSQUE MASJID AL-TAWHID

Charity number: 1115472
Charity reporting is up to date (86 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 01 July 2023 26 July 2024 86 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 July 2023 26 July 2024 86 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 01 January 2022 23 December 2022 52 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 January 2022 23 December 2022 52 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 01 January 2021 01 November 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 01 January 2021 01 November 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 01 January 2020 30 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 01 January 2020 30 October 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 01 January 2019 20 March 2020 140 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 January 2019 20 March 2020 140 days late Download Open in new window