Trustees ST MARY'S INDIAN ORTHODOX CHURCH
Charity number: 1113931

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
15 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev John Varughese Mannamcheril | Chair | 01 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Reji Thomas | Trustee | 01 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Lijo Kunjukunju Joshua | Trustee | 01 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Saji Varghese | Trustee | 01 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Binu Philipose | Trustee | 01 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Dennis Daniel | Trustee | 01 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Anil Thomas | Trustee | 01 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Thomas David | Trustee | 01 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Anil Varghese | Trustee | 01 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Alka Kurian | Trustee | 01 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Kurian Lukose | Trustee | 01 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Shon John Pallickaleth | Trustee | 01 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
NIJU PHILIP | Trustee | 27 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
Rev VARGHESE MATHEW | Trustee | 01 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
Bibin George | Trustee | 25 June 2017 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.