Financial history SEASIDE RADIO LIMITED

Charity number: 1115311
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £18.66k £17.55k £3.61k £294 £0
Total expenditure £26.08k £33.52k £17.38k £305 £18
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A