Accounts and annual returns BECOMING VISIBLE LIMITED

Charity number: 1117872
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 31 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 31 January 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 21 March 2024 50 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 21 March 2024 50 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 09 June 2023 129 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 09 June 2023 129 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 09 June 2023 494 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 09 June 2023 494 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 09 June 2023 859 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 09 June 2023 859 days late Download Open in new window