Financial history BECOMING VISIBLE LIMITED

Charity number: 1117872
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £381.87k £427.86k £529.22k £533.39k £501.73k
Total expenditure £366.95k £395.39k £501.52k £525.58k £494.46k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A £443 £724 £3.66k
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A £528.78k £532.66k £498.07k
Income - Endowments N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Income - Other N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A £501.52k £311.39k £494.46k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A £124.54k £214.20k £229.33k
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A £0 £214.20k £0