ZANE: ZIMBABWE A NATIONAL EMERGENCY

Charity number: 1112949
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

- The provision of food, medicine and support to pensioners, including WW2 and other Commonwealth veterans and their widows. ZANE works in partnership with RCEL. - Small scale community education, training and farming projects in impoverished communities. - Health programmes: clubfoot correction, hearing aids, prosthetic limbs for mine victims.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024

Charitable expenditure

Charitable expenditure

Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.

In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.

Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.

By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity has one or more trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
  • Disability
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
  • Overseas Aid/famine Relief
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales
  • Zimbabwe

Governance

Registration history:
  • 07 February 2006: Standard registration
  • 19 June 2014: Funds received from 1104512 HOMES IN ZIMBABWE
  • 13 November 2024: Funds received from 277472 THE CLUMBER CHARITABLE TRUST
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:
  • ZANE (Working name)
Company number:
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
JUDITH MELLOR OBE Chair 07 August 2017
None on record
David Alexander Ross Trustee 10 February 2025
None on record
CHARLES FORD Trustee 27 March 2024
None on record
Caroline Philippa Compston Trustee 27 March 2024
Wild Arts
Received: On time
David Gordon Covell Trustee 15 July 2022
None on record
Nicola Passaportis OBE Trustee 04 November 2020
None on record
CHRISTOPHER DEAN COMPSTON Trustee 24 December 2012
None on record
NICOLA MARY GAYNER Trustee 01 February 2012
None on record
JOHN BROADLEY CMG Trustee 01 February 2012
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023 05/04/2024
Total gross income £3.16m £4.29m £4.10m £3.44m £3.79m
Total expenditure £3.10m £3.72m £3.92m £3.74m £3.47m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £440.74k £410.09k N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £2.70m £4.28m £4.06m £3.39m £3.73m
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £17.59k £16.58k £38.49k £46.32k £52.72k
Income - Other £440.92k £710 £274 £279 £1.48k
Income - Legacies £0 £159.77k £75.40k £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £2.43m £3.13m £3.21m £3.14m £2.83m
Expenditure - Raising funds £667.82k £556.47k £697.62k £574.43k £600.30k
Expenditure - Governance £35.57k £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £35.01k £17.49k £27.76k £34.33k

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023 05/04/2024
Own use assets £9.54k £8.30k £6.33k £4.05k £1.88k
Long-term investments £1.55m £3.18m £3.27m £2.51m £2.82m
Other assets £307.13k £292.85k £314.03k £204.63k £437.41k
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Total liabilities £56.80k £19.52k £30.86k £26.66k £76.21k

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2024 18 December 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2024 18 December 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2023 22 December 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2023 22 December 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2022 20 December 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2022 20 December 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2021 17 December 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2021 17 December 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2020 07 December 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 07 December 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
2 Church Street
Bladon
Woodstock
OX20 1RS
Phone:
02070606643