Trustees ZANE: ZIMBABWE A NATIONAL EMERGENCY
Charity number: 1112949

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JUDITH MELLOR OBE | Chair | 07 August 2017 |
|
|
||||
David Alexander Ross | Trustee | 10 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
CHARLES FORD | Trustee | 27 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Caroline Philippa Compston | Trustee | 27 March 2024 |
|
|||||
David Gordon Covell | Trustee | 15 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Nicola Passaportis OBE | Trustee | 04 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
CHRISTOPHER DEAN COMPSTON | Trustee | 24 December 2012 |
|
|
||||
NICOLA MARY GAYNER | Trustee | 01 February 2012 |
|
|
||||
JOHN BROADLEY CMG | Trustee | 01 February 2012 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.