Accounts and annual returns FRIENDS OF RUFFORD SCHOOL

Charity number: 1112269
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2024 24 February 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2023 12 April 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2022 14 February 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2021 02 May 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2020 04 July 2021 34 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 Not Required