Trustees FRIENDS OF RUFFORD SCHOOL

Charity Number: 1112269
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Kirsty Harrison Chair 12 September 2020
None on record
Carolyn Dark Trustee 14 November 2024
None on record
Victoria Thornley Trustee 10 February 2023
None on record
Katie Lester Trustee 14 December 2020
None on record
Rachel Sarah Ryding Trustee 12 September 2020
None on record
Dr Abigail Williamson Trustee 12 September 2020
None on record
Rachel Elleray Trustee 08 July 2020
None on record