YES TO LIFE LTD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Yes to Life empowers people with cancer to make informed decisions about their cancer care options by providing information from experts to guide people through the confusing options for care and lifestyle choices. We offer individual support through our helpline and website, and information through blogs and publications, radio broadcasts, workshops and educational programme.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

10 Trustee(s)
52 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 24 January 2006: Standard registration
- Y2L (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ROBIN MICHAEL KIRKPATRICK DALY | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Sheryl Anne Rylance | Trustee | 21 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Clare Cowan | Trustee | 27 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Lisa Morris | Trustee | 27 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Hanna Spiridonidis | Trustee | 27 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Adrian Taylor | Trustee | 16 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Nicola Simone Lafayette | Trustee | 10 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
April Ozlem Moss | Trustee | 24 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dominic Brierley | Trustee | 07 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
JEROME BURNE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £159.43k | £159.43k | £347.98k | £110.83k | £193.87k | |
|
Total expenditure | £184.79k | £184.79k | £228.63k | £189.16k | £183.21k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 21 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 06 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 11 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 11 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 19 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 19 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 20 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 20 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 30 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 30 JUNE 2005
Charitable objects
(1) THE RELIEF AND SUPPORT OF PERSONS SUFFERING FROM CANCER, AND THEIR CARERS: 1. DEVELOP INTEGRATED WEB SERVICES TO: (A) PROVIDE AN ACCESSIBLE, INDEPENDENT OVERVIEW OF ALTERNATIVE TREATMENTS, RESOURCES AND FUNDING (B) COLLECT AND SHARE ALTERNATIVE CANCER TREATMENT RECORDS (C) PROVIDE A FORUM FOR THE EXCHANGE OF EXPERIENCE AND KNOWLEDGE OF ALTERNATIVE TREATMENTS (D) ENABLE CONNECTION WITH OTHER PERSONS WHO ARE, OR HAVE BEEN IN SIMILAR CIRCUMSTANCES 2. RAISE AND DISTRIBUTE FUNDS TO DIRECTLY SUPPORT THE PROVISION OF ALTERNATIVE TREATMENTS FOR CANCER AND TERMINAL ILLNESS IN THE UNITED KINGDOM (2) THE ADVANCEMENT OF PUBLIC EDUCATION IN NEW APPROACHES TO THE PREVENTION, DIAGNOSIS AND TREATMENT OF CANCER, IN PARTICULAR BASED ON AN INTEGRATED APPROACH: 1. RAISE PUBLIC AWARENESS OF ALTERNATIVE TREATMENTS AND ASSIST IN MAKING THEM MORE GENERALLY AVAILABLE. 2. PROMOTE IMPROVED CO-OPERATION BETWEEN THE NHS AND ALTERNATIVE PRACTITIONERS, AND THEREBY DEVELOP A BROADER, MORE INTEGRATED APPROACH TO CANCER TREATMENT IN THE UK 3. PROVIDE NHS DOCTORS, ALTERNATIVE PRACTITIONERS AND OTHER HEALTH PROFESSIONALS WITH ACCESS TO TREATMENT HISTORIES AND SUMMARY STATISTICS REGARDING ALTERNATIVE TREATMENTS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
71-75 SHELTON STREET
COVENT GARDEN
LONDON
WC2H 9JQ
- Phone:
- 02032220587
- Email:
- miquel.leon@yestolife.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window