MARTON VILLAGE HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Village Hall provides social and recreational activities for the community.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 May 2024
Total income includes £5,000 from 1 government grant(s)
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Powys
- Shropshire
Governance
- 24 November 2005: Standard registration
No other names
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Patricia Blakemore | Trustee | 28 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
CHARLES HILAIRE PUGH | Trustee |
|
||||||
VIVIEN ANN MEREDITH | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
CHRISTINE ELIZABETH RICHARDS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DAVID THOMAS TROW | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/03/2020 | 30/03/2021 | 30/03/2022 | 30/04/2023 | 31/05/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £8.87k | £29.07k | £5.76k | £4.08k | £16.30k | |
|
Total expenditure | £7.30k | £5.12k | £8.37k | £11.04k | £21.09k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £27.93k | N/A | N/A | £5.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2024 | 06 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2023 | 21 October 2024 | 235 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 March 2022 | 24 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 March 2021 | 18 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 March 2021 | 18 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 March 2020 | 05 February 2021 | 6 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 23 SEPTEMBER 2005
Charitable objects
THE PROPERTY AND THE TRUST FUND AND ITS INCOME SHALL BE APPLIED FOR THE PURPOSE OF A VILLAGE HALL FOR THE USE OF INHABITANTS OF MARTON IN THE PARISH OF CHIRBURY WITH BROMPTON AND WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, AGE, DISABILITY, NATIONALITY, RACE OR POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS, INCLUDING USE OF THE PROPERTY FOR MEETINGS, LECTURES AND CLASSES OR OTHER FORMS OF RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Area of benefit
MARTON IN THE PARISH OF CHIRBURY WITH BROMPTON.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Lower Stockton
Marton
WELSHPOOL
Powys
SY21 8JL
- Phone:
- 01938580116
- Email:
- felicitybevan@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window