Financial history COUNTY DURHAM FURNITURE HELP SCHEME

Charity number: 1112344
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £459.00k £475.00k £579.43k £475.96k £765.46k
Total expenditure £453.20k £465.00k £545.92k £558.68k £694.15k
Income from government contracts £300.00k £220.00k £380.00k N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £80.00k N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A £7.01k N/A £203.09k
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A £0 N/A £0
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A £487.25k N/A £562.37k
Income - Endowments N/A N/A £0 N/A £0
Income - Investment N/A N/A £0 N/A £2
Income - Other N/A N/A £85.18k N/A £0
Income - Legacies N/A N/A £0 N/A £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A £545.92k N/A £694.15k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A £0 N/A £0
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A £5.94k N/A £0
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A £0 N/A £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A £0 N/A £0
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A £0 N/A £0