ENGLAND AND WALES CRICKET TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To promote community participation in healthy recreation by providing facilities for playing cricket and to promote all purposes as recognised as charitable under the laws of England and Wales through an association with cricket.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 January 2024
Total income:
£22,006,695
Donations and legacies | £20.00m | |
Charitable activities | £613.50k | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £903.20k | |
Other | £490.00k |
Total expenditure:
£26,050,457
Raising funds | £10.14k | |
Charitable activities | £26.04m | |
Other | £0 |
£33,243 investments gains (losses)
Total income includes £613,500 from 1 government grant(s)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £10.14k | |
Charitable expenditure | £26.04m |
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 16 December 2005: Standard registration
No other names
- Investment
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Richard Thompson | Trustee | 16 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Nimesh Kataria | Trustee | 08 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Richard Gould | Trustee | 02 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Forhad Hussain | Trustee | 02 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Peter David Ackerley | Trustee | 15 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Sancha Christina Legg | Trustee | 15 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Ruth Leah Sienkiewicz | Trustee | 15 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
James Harry Wood | Trustee | 12 September 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/01/2020 | 31/01/2021 | 31/01/2022 | 31/01/2023 | 31/01/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £16.82m | £27.37m | £45.46m | £1.37m | £22.01m | |
|
Total expenditure | £12.90m | £19.75m | £24.03m | £29.75m | £26.05m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £982.00k | £796.13k | N/A | N/A | £613.50k | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £15.65m | £26.41m | £44.00m | £0 | £20.00m | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £982.00k | £796.13k | £974.39k | £617.65k | £613.50k | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £185.88k | £111.80k | £38.97k | £741.91k | £903.20k | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £49.71k | £450.00k | £10.00k | £490.00k | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £12.89m | £19.75m | £23.61m | £29.28m | £26.04m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £8.34k | £8.45k | £27.22k | £31.89k | £10.14k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £19.41k | £91.71k | £27.22k | £440.36k | £773.81k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £22.64m | £25.38m | £25.27m | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £31.89k | £10.14k | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £389.40k | £440.36k | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/01/2020 | 31/01/2021 | 31/01/2022 | 31/01/2023 | 31/01/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £0 | £0 | £20.72m | £0 | £0 | |
|
Long-term investments | £11.34m | £23.38m | £0 | £37.08m | £8.12m | |
|
Other assets | £27.88m | £24.82m | £51.54m | £8.68m | £30.74m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £936.62k | £2.30m | £4.96m | £6.84m | £3.95m |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 January 2024 | 09 January 2025 | 40 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2024 | 09 January 2025 | 40 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2023 | 28 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2023 | 28 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2022 | 18 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2022 | 18 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2021 | 13 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2021 | 13 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2020 | 24 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2020 | 24 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 17 JUNE 2005 as amended on 15 Jan 2020 as amended on 15 Jan 2020
Charitable objects
(1) PROMOTE COMMUNITY PARTICIPATION IN HEALTHY RECREATION BY PROVIDING FACILITIES FOR PLAYING CRICKET AND OTHER SPORTS ("FACILITIES" MEANS LAND, BUILDINGS EQUIPMENT AND ORGANISING SPORTING ACTIVITIES); (2) TO PROVIDE AND ASSIST IN PROVIDING FACILITIES FOR SPORT, RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF SUCH PERSONS WHO HAVE NEED FOR SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY R DISABLEMENT, POVERTY OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES OR FOR THE PUBLIC AT LARGE IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE; AND (3) TO PROMOTE ALL PURPOSES RECOGNISED AS CHARITABLE UNDER THE LAWS OF ENGLAND AND WALES FROM TIME TO TIME IN PARTICULAR THROUGH AN ASSOCIATION WITH CRICKET.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED.
Contact information
- Address:
-
England and Wales Cricket Trust
Lord's Cricket Ground
St Johns Wood
London
NW88QZ
- Phone:
- 02074321200
- Email:
- nimet.nathani@ecb.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window