YARNTON MEDICAL PRACTICE TRUST FUND
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To receive donations from patients of the Medical Practice and other persons for the purpose of providing equipment for the Medical Practice.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 January 2013
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Other Defined Groups
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Oxfordshire
Governance
- 03 July 2006: Standard registration
- 15 February 2014: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/01/2009 | 31/01/2010 | 31/01/2011 | 31/01/2012 | 31/01/2013 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.44k | £3.76k | £3.76k | £1.78k | £1.98k | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £5.56k | £5.56k | £1.01k | £1.26k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 January 2014 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2014 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2013 | 05 July 2013 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2013 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2012 | 11 October 2012 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2012 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2011 | 17 August 2011 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2011 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DEED OF TRUST DATED 18 NOVEMBER 2005 AS AMENDED 5 JUNE 2006
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS IN PERSONS IN THE DISTRICT OF YARNTON, INCLUDING PATIENTS OF THE YARNTON MEDICAL CENTRE BY THE PROVISIONS OF EQUIPMENT AND OTHER AMENITIES AND GENERALLY TO SUPPORT ANY CHARITABLE WORK OF THE SAID MEDICAL CENTRE.
Area of benefit
DISTRICT OF YARNTON
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window