THE FUSILIER MUSEUM MEMORIAL TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Holds the collection of XX The Lancashire Fusiliers and The Royal Regiment of Fusiliers for displaying to the public in the recently restored Fusilier Museum, Moss St Bury.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Bury
- Manchester City
- Rochdale
- Salford City
Governance
- 16 June 2008: Standard registration
- THE FUSILIERS MUSEUM TRUST, LANCASHIRE (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
COLONEL BRIAN MARK GORSKI MBE MSC | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Martin Newman | Trustee | 05 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
IAIN RUSSELL TOPLISS | Trustee | 14 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Lt. Colonel Iain MacDonald Hallam | Trustee | 11 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Leutenant Colonel David Cook | Trustee | 01 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
JOHN KERSHAW AIB | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
CAPT JOHN O'GRADY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JOHN PHILIP DUNNE | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £7.66k | £5.69k | £6.30k | £7.17k | £6.79k | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.32k | £5.38k | £4.01k | £8.43k | £11.61k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 24 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 12 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 28 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 22 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST 29 MARCH 2007 AS AMENDED ON 24 MAR 2017
Charitable objects
(1) TO EDUCATE THE PUBLIC AND MEMBERS OF THE REGIMENT IN THE HISTORY AND MILITARY ACCOMPLISHMENTS OF THE REGIMENT AND THE FORMER REGIMENT; (2) TO PROMOTE MILITARY EFFICIENCY AND ENCOURAGE RECRUITMENT BY PUBLIC EXHIBITION OF THE COLLECTION IN A MUSEUM OR MUSEUMS OR SUCH OTHER PUBLIC PLACES AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DECIDE; (3) TO CONSERVE, RESTORE, REPAIR, RE-CONSTRUCT AND PRESERVE OBJECTS IN THE COLLECTION; AND (4) TO MAINTAIN, REPAIR AND PROTECT THE WAR MEMORIALS OF THE FORMER REGIMENT (WHETHER SUCH MEMORIAL FORMS PART OF THE COLLECTION OR NOT).
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
11 Raven Meols Lane
Formby
LIVERPOOL
L37 4BY
- Phone:
- 01704870536
- Email:
- johnkershaw1@virginmedia.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window