TEACH AFRICA
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To provide secondary education support to the children of the Nairobi slums. This is done in the form of a bursary that provides funding for school fees and essential school equipment including where necessary, uniforms.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2018
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Kenya
Governance
- 06 December 2005: Standard registration
- 21 November 2020: Removed (Funds spent (by trustees))
- TEACH ( THE EDUCATING AFRICA CHARITY ) (Working name)
- BARCLAYCARD INTERNATIONAL AFRICAN SCHOOLS SUPPORT COMMITTEE (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2014 | 31/12/2015 | 31/12/2016 | 31/12/2017 | 31/12/2018 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £27.79k | £19.85k | £23.30k | £5.17k | £536 | |
|
Total expenditure | £27.76k | £16.68k | £13.39k | £13.55k | £4.32k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2018 | 10 March 2020 | 131 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2018 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2017 | 08 October 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2017 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2016 | 16 October 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2016 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED ON 22 SEPTEMBER 2005 AS AMENDED 30 NOVEMBER 2005
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE THOSE STUDENTS OF MUKURU KWA NJENGA PRIMARY SCHOOL IN NAIROBI, KENYA WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED (IN PARTICULAR WHERE THEY, THEIR FAMILIES AND/OR THEIR CAREERS ARE EXPERIENCING FINANCIAL HARDSHIP) AND TO ADVANCE THEIR EDUCATION IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY: A) PROVIDING ANNUAL 4 YEAR BURSARIES TO THE TOP 10 PERFORMING STUDENTS TO CONTRIBUTE TOWARDS THE COSTS ASSOCIATED WITH THEIR PURSUIT OF SECONDARY EDUCATION; AND B) PROVIDING AD HOC FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE IN ORDER THAT SCHOOL EQUIPMENT CAN BE PROVIDED FOR THE BENEFIT OF ALL STUDENTS IN THE SCHOOL (AS ADVISED BY THE HEADMASTER) WITH THE AIM OF PROMOTING THE STUDENTS' MENTAL, SPIRITUAL, MORAL AND PHYSICAL DEVELOPMENT AND IMPROVEMENT SO AS TO DEVELOP THEIR FULL CAPACITIES AND ENABLE THEM TO BECOME RESPONSIBLE MEMBERS OF SOCIETY AND SO THAT THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE MAYBE IMPROVED.
Area of benefit
MUKURU KWA NJENGA PRIMARY SCHOOL IN NAIROBI, KENYA.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window