Financial history FRIENDS OF ST FRANCIS DE SALES INFANT AND JUNIOR SCHOOLS

Charity number: 1112318
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £4.91k £0 £0 £0 £4.39k
Total expenditure £0 £0 £0 £1.43k £140
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A