UNPLUGGED RECYCLING

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
A electrical recycling service provided by disadvantaged volunteers for the benefit of the entire community.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Disability
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Charitable Purposes
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Lincolnshire
Governance
- 01 December 2005: Standard registration
- UNPLUGGED (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SOPHIE MANN | Chair |
|
|
|||||
FIONA MCBARRON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
RACHAEL VANESSA HARRIS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £16.84k | £57.33k | £17.36k | £11.65k | £1.00k | |
|
Total expenditure | £50.72k | £41.78k | £31.83k | £14.82k | £11.50k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £10.00k | £29.06k | £4.69k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 10 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 22 August 2024 | 114 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 17 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 30 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 30 March 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 08 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 10 JUNE 2002 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 11 AUGUST 2005
Charitable objects
A) TO ADVANCE THE PUBLIC EDUCATION IN THE BENEFIT OF PROTECTING AND PRESERVING THE ENVIRONMENT BY THE IMPLEMENTATION AND PROMOTION OF SCHEMES INVOLVING THE RECYCLING AND REPROCESSING OF ELECTRICAL ARTICLES THAT WOULD OTHERWISE GO TO LANDFILL B) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AMONG YOUNG PEOPLE AND ADULTS, INCLUDING THOSE, WITH SPECIAL NEEDS, BY THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES AS WILL ENABLE SUCH PERSONS TO ACQUIRE AND DEVELOP VOCATIONAL SKILLS WHICH WILL ENHANCE THEIR EMPLOYMENT PROSPECTS. C) THE PROTECTION AND PRESERVATION OF THE ENVIRONMENT BY THE PROVISION OF A RECYCLING AND DISPOSAL SERVICE FOR ELECTRICAL ARTICLES THAT WOULD OTHERWISE GO TO LANDFILL
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE. LINCOLNSHIRE
Contact information
- Address:
-
Unplugged
Unit 2
Haven Business Park
Slippery Gowt Lane
Wyberton
BOSTON
- Phone:
- 01205355511
- Email:
- weareunplugged@aol.com
- Website:
-
weareunplugged.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window