FRIENDS OF ETHIOPIAN CHILDREN IN NEED
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
FECIN supports two projects in Tigray, Northern Ethiopia: Alshaday Orphanage at Wukro, near Makele. We provide funds for projects that improve conditions and life chances for the children there. Mums for Mums in Makele providing training for single mothers to help them become self reliant. It also trains single mothers as AIDS/HIV counsellors and supports HIV/AIDS sufferers in the own homes.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2018
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Other Finance
- Throughout England
- Ethiopia
Governance
- 21 March 2006: Standard registration
- 11 January 2020: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- FECIN (Working name)
- FRIENDS OF ETHOPIAN CHILDREN IN NEED (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2014 | 31/03/2015 | 31/03/2016 | 31/03/2017 | 31/03/2018 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £9.95k | £29.88k | £27.15k | £8.71k | £5.17k | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.07k | £34.15k | £18.49k | £14.17k | £11.49k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2018 | 19 October 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2018 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2017 | 23 November 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2017 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2016 | 29 December 2016 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 March 2016
(These accounts |
11 January 2017 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 22 JUNE 2005 AS AMENDED AT AN EXTRAORDINARY MEETING DATED 8 MARCH 2006.
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE POVERTY AND SICKNESS, TO PRESERVE AND PROTECT HEALTH AND ADVANCE EDUCATION, AMONG MOTHERS AND CHILDREN IN ETHIOPIA WHO ARE IN NEED IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY PROVISION OF FUNDS AND SUCH OTHER ASSISTANCE AS MAY BE DEEMED CHARITABLE AT LAW.
Area of benefit
ETHIOPIA.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window