SKILLSHOP LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
WE ARE A WORKSHOP FOR ADULTS WITH LEARNING DIFFICULTIES, PROVIDING OPPORTUNITIES TO ENHANCE THEIR LIFE SKILLS.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2023
Total income includes £325,529 from 1 government contract(s)
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Calderdale
Governance
- 17 June 2006: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Adam Tyson | Trustee | 01 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Lee Bell | Trustee | 29 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Stevie Stott | Trustee | 17 July 2013 |
|
|
||||
PATRICIA AMELIA MACLEAN | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £267.00k | £307.00k | £318.67k | £399.03k | £343.46k | |
|
Total expenditure | £267.00k | £307.00k | £279.39k | £346.81k | £354.65k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £115.00k | £280.00k | £180.86k | £226.46k | £325.53k | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 107 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 107 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 05 March 2024 | 34 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 05 March 2024 | 34 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 08 February 2023 | 8 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 22 March 2023 | 50 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 23 March 2022 | 51 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 23 March 2022 | 51 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 19 April 2021 | 78 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 19 April 2021 | 78 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 13 SEPTEMBER 2005 AS AMENDED 10 MARCH 2006
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE A CENTRE OF EXCELLENCE ACCESSIBLE TO YOUNG ADULTS WITH LEARNING DIFFICULTIES AND A STATEMENT OF NEEDS IN THE CALDERDALE BOROUGH AREA AND PROVIDE: * PROPERLY EQUIPPED PREMISES * QUALIFIED PERSONNEL TO DELIVER THE TRAINING * WORK WITH LOCAL VOLUNTARY ORGANIZATIONS * SOURCE WORK PLACEMENTS FOR ATTENDEES * ACTIVELY FUND RAISE AND ACQUIRE SPONSORS FOR THE PROJECT TO COVER ALL COSTS OF THE RUNNING OF THE CENTRE GENERAL AND SPECIFIC
Area of benefit
CALDERDALE BOROUGH AREA
Contact information
- Address:
-
Treveleyn
Keighley Road
HALIFAX
West Yorkshire
HX2 8HE
- Phone:
- 01422 242 777
- Email:
- office@skillshop.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window