FRIENDS FOR CHILDREN FFC

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
* to relieve the poverty, hardship and distress among Ethiopian children orphaned as a result of HIV/AIDS by providing financial/material support for the said orphans, and where possible * to assist with donation and advice charities working for the rights of and with orphans and street children
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Oxfordshire
- Ethiopia
Governance
- 10 July 2006: Standard registration
No other names
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DR GIRMA YIMAR GETAHUN | Chair |
|
|
|||||
ABRAHAM WOLDEGIORGIS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
AMBESOU AWOLU | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
SOLOMON DEGEFA | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.88k | £4.03k | £4.32k | £4.17k | £3.32k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.99k | £5.63k | £155 | £6.58k | £6.90k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 11 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 18 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 20 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 30 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 30 May 2022 | 334 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 11.06.06
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF POVERTY, HARDSHIP AND DISTRESS AMONG CHILDREN ORPHANED AS A RESULT OF HIV/AIDS IN PARTICULAR BUT EXCLUSIVELY BY PROVIDING FINANCIAL/MATERIAL SUPPORT FOR THE SAID ORPHANS AND WHERE POSSIBLE ASSISTING WITH DONATION AND ADVICE CHARITIES WORKING FOR THE RIGHTS OF AND WITH ORPHANS AD STREET CHILDREN.
Area of benefit
NATIONAL AND OVERSEAS
Contact information
- Address:
-
22 MALTFIELD ROAD
HEADINGTON
OXFORD
OX3 9RG
- Phone:
- 07954591124
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window