EAGLES COMMUNITY FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To promote community participation in healthy recreation by providing facilities for playing basketball. To provide facilities for sport and recreation for people who need such facilities and To advance the education of children and young people through such means as the trustees think fit
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2023
Total income:
£1,612,387
Donations and legacies | £85.44k | |
Charitable activities | £616.13k | |
Other trading activities | £810.34k | |
Investments | £0 | |
Other | £100.49k |
Total expenditure:
£1,630,526
Raising funds | £0 | |
Charitable activities | £1.63m | |
Other | £0 |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Total income includes £10,250 from 1 government contract(s) and £34,935 from 2 government grant(s)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £0 | |
Charitable expenditure | £1.63m |
People

70 Employee(s)
7 Trustee(s)
79 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Disability
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Cumbria
- Durham
- Gateshead
- North Tyneside
- Northumberland
- South Tyneside
- Sunderland
Governance
- 15 February 2006: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PAUL BLAKE | Chair |
|
||||||
Stephen Savage | Trustee | 10 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
JEFFREY KING | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DAVID LEWIS FORRESTER | Trustee |
|
||||||
ERIC VICTOR WILSON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ALAN YOUNGER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MS SU CUMMING | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2019 | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.95m | £946.13k | £974.16k | £1.23m | £1.61m | |
|
Total expenditure | £883.78k | £873.25k | £927.31k | £1.18m | £1.63m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £10.25k | |
|
Income from government grants | £1.31m | £165.48k | £245.22k | £15.29k | £34.94k | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £82.03k | £214.03k | £25.48k | £27.94k | £85.44k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £190.24k | £324.42k | £448.37k | £0 | £810.34k | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £1.61m | £242.20k | £153.72k | £1.10m | £616.13k | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Other | £68.70k | £165.48k | £346.60k | £101.93k | £100.49k | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £883.78k | £873.25k | £927.31k | £1.18m | £1.63m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £167.84k | £57.66k | £31.30k | £188.60k | £204.72k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/07/2019 | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £6.93m | £6.88m | £6.88m | £6.85m | £6.80m | |
|
Long-term investments | £1 | £1 | £1 | £1 | £0 | |
|
Other assets | £207.75k | £213.98k | £592.69k | £530.51k | £517.21k | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £3.60m | £3.48m | £3.82m | £3.67m | £3.63m |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 03 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | 03 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 31 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 31 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 27 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | 27 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 30 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | 30 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2019 | 15 October 2020 | 137 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2019 | 15 October 2020 | 137 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 22 MARCH 2005 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 26 OCTOBER 2005
Charitable objects
FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC GENERALLY AND, IN PARTICULAR, THE INHABITANTS OF TYNE AND WEAR, NORTHUMBERLAND, COUNTY DURHAM AND CUMBRIA AND THEIR SURROUNDING AREAS: 3.1 TO PROMOTE COMMUNITY PARTICIPATION IN HEALTHY RECREATION BY PROVIDING FACILITIES FOR THE PLAYING OF BASKETBALL AND OTHER SPORTS OR ACTIVITIES CAPABLE OF IMPROVING PHYSICAL HEALTH ("FACILITIES" IN THIS CLAUSE 3 MEANS LAND, BUILDINGS, EQUIPMENT AND ORGANISING SPORTING ACTIVITIES); 3.2 TO PROVIDE AND ASSIST IN PROVIDING FACILITIES FOR SPORT, RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF SUCH PERSONS WHO HAVE NEED FOR SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, ETHNICITY, INFIRMITY OR DISABLEMENT, POVERTY OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES OR FOR THE PUBLIC AT LARGE IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE; AND 3.3 TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE THROUGH SUCH MEANS AS THE TRUSTEES THINK FIT IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE LAW OF CHARITY.
Area of benefit
TYNE AND WEAR, NORTHUMBERLAND, COUNTY DURHAM AND CUMBRIA AND THEIR SURROUNDING AREAS
Contact information
- Address:
-
Eagles Community Arena
Scotswood Road
NEWCASTLE UPON TYNE
NE4 7AF
- Phone:
- 01912453881
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window