Financial history THE MIDLAND DYSLEXIA EDUCATION TRUST

Charity Number: 1117736
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2011 31/12/2012 31/12/2013 31/12/2014 31/12/2016
Total gross income £5.73k £1.78k £0 £0 £0
Total expenditure £3.95k £100 £0 £0 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A £0