Financial history Citizens Advice Darlington, Redcar and Cleveland

Charity number: 1112414
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £729.53k £751.32k £1.50m £986.82k £1.25m
Total expenditure £627.67k £716.12k £1.07m £989.29k £1.11m
Income from government contracts £370.06k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £35.00k £496.25k £806.58k £739.26k £844.74k
Income - Donations and legacies £2.78k £39.07k £359.57k £3.82k £2.42k
Income - Other trading activities £58.41k £76.84k £7.47k £12.87k £2.37k
Income - Charitable activities £665.17k £631.35k £1.11m £940.18k £1.23m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £168 £61 £38 £593 £586
Income - Other £3.00k £4.00k £27.12k £29.35k £11.59k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £627.67k £716.12k £1.07m £989.29k £1.11m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £0 £2.88k £2.88k £6.32k £13.00k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0