ART REFUGE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We support people who have been displaced due to conflict, persecution and poverty, in the UK and internationally, through socially engaged art, art therapy, training, education and research. We also engage the public in issues relating to refugees, trafficked people, those seeking asylum and other displaced persons through research dissemination, exhibitions and other activities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £10,450 from 2 government grant(s)
People

6 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Children/young People
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Bristol City
- Hackney
- Kent
- France
- Nepal
Governance
- 23 May 2006: Standard registration
- ART REFUGE - UK (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Chris Wood | Chair | 04 June 2016 |
|
|
||||
ANNA JANE CASTLETON SIMMONS | Trustee | 12 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Timothy Michael Richards | Trustee | 12 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Polly Bagnall | Trustee | 26 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
Kathryn Cronin Dr | Trustee | 25 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
Dr Ravi Kohli | Trustee | 21 January 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £60.37k | £32.46k | £93.85k | £70.68k | £108.17k | |
|
Total expenditure | £45.40k | £38.52k | £67.34k | £87.98k | £97.12k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £6.00k | £10.45k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 19 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 19 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 17 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 17 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 12 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 12 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 12 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 12 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 23 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 23 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 18/05/2006 AS AMENDED ON 04/06/2006 AS AMENDED BY DEED DATED 02/09/2013 AS AMENDED ON 07 DEC 2019 AS AMENDED ON 28 SEP 2019
Charitable objects
1. TO IMPROVE THE MENTAL HEALTH AND WELLBEING OF REFUGEES, ASYLUM SEEKERS, TRAFFICKED PEOPLE AND INTERNALLY DISPLACED PERSONS IN THE UK AND INTERNATIONALLY, THROUGH SOCIALLY ENGAGED ART, ART THERAPY, TRAINING, EDUCATION AND RESEARCH. 2. TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE UK AND INTERNATIONALLY, ABOUT THE ISSUES RELATING TO REFUGEES, TRAFFICKED PEOPLE, THOSE SEEKING ASYLUM AND OTHER DISPLACED PERSONS; THROUGH RESEARCH DISSEMINATION AND ACTIVITIES SUCH AS, BUT NOT LIMITED TO, EXHIBITIONS.
Area of benefit
UK AND INTERNATIONAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
ART REFUGE
The Coach House
2 Upper York Street
Bristol
BS2 8QN
- Phone:
- 07865240978
- Email:
- info@artrefuge.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window