RURAL EDUCATION & ARTS PROJECT
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
REAP is a rural community arts organisation, working with some of the most isolated and scattered rural communities across the Peak District in Derbyshire and Staffordshire. Supporting local people in the expression and preservation of the areas culture. We use a variety of art forms such as Dance, Drama, Music, Rural Crafts and Creative Arts, We also stage a major arts festivals annually.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2008
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Cheshire East
- Cheshire West & Chester
- Derbyshire
- Staffordshire
Governance
- 07 December 2005: Standard registration
- 27 May 2010: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2007 | 31/03/2008 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £142.01k | £136.28k | |
|
Total expenditure | £80.25k | £174.96k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2009 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2009 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2008 | 18 December 2008 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2008 | 18 December 2008 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2007 | 29 November 2007 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2007 | 29 November 2007 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 16 SEPTEMBER 2005
Charitable objects
1, TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN PARTICULAR BUT WITHOUT LIMITING THE FOREGOING REGARDING THE HISTORY OF THE STAFFORDSHIRE MOORLANDS AND THE ADJOINING AREAS OF DERBYSHIRE AND CHESHIRE 2, TO PRESERVE AND PROTECT FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT SUCH OF THE LAND SITUATED IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT WHICH IS OF SCIENTIFIC, EDUCATIONAL INTEREST OR IS AN AREA OF OUTSTANDING BEAUTY 3, TO PROMOTE SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSE OR PURPOSES IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT AS THE DIRECTORS IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION THINK FIT.
Area of benefit
STAFFORDSHIRE MOORLANDS AND SURROUNDING AREAS OF DERBYSHIRE AND CHESHIRE
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window