RISING TIDE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Rising Tide is a music education and industry linked development charity, working with local people to raise aspirations and employment opportunities in the music and related industries. By using music, Rising Tide offers quality workshops to the community that re engage excluded young people and those deemed socially excluded.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £10,320 from 3 government grant(s)
People

6 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout London
Governance
- 10 April 2006: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Akhun Ahmun | Trustee | 16 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Kimberley Louisa GODDARD | Trustee | 16 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Melisha Sonia Nanette JOHN | Trustee | 13 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Franklyn Irving SWEENEY | Trustee | 07 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jake Benjamin FERGUSON | Trustee | 07 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jay Davidson | Trustee | 20 March 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £48.26k | £10.67k | £20.27k | £35.43k | £18.18k | |
|
Total expenditure | £48.60k | £9.51k | £14.74k | £33.57k | £17.72k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £21.41k | £4.09k | £13.45k | £32.09k | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £6.05k | £6.68k | N/A | £10.32k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 07 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 09 February 2024 | 9 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 09 February 2024 | 9 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 28 February 2023 | 28 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 31 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 29 March 2021 | 57 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 12 April 2021 | 71 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 11 JUNE 2001 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 5 APRIL 2006.
Charitable objects
1) TO ADVANCE THE ARTS FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, THROUGH THE PERFORMANCE AND TEACHING OF MUSIC ALL CULTURES AND TRADITIONS, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY AMONGST THOSE IN SOCIALLY AND ECONOMICALLY DISADVANTAGED GROUPS AND COMMUNITIES; AND 2) TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TRAINING IN MUSIC FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED IN PRACTICE GREATER LONDON
Contact information
- Address:
-
Rising Tide Trust
The Picturehouse Building
270 Mare Street
London
E8 1HE
- Phone:
- 020 8986 3222
- Email:
- info@rising-tide.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window