Financial history CHILDREN OF PAKISTAN EARTHQUAKE

Charity number: 1113135
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £161.22k £389.51k £375.74k £390.00k £303.44k
Total expenditure £156.21k £282.96k £424.47k £353.97k £244.71k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A