Financial history CHURCHFIELDS INFANTS' SCHOOL NURSERY UNIT & LANGUAGE FACILITY SCHOOL FUND

Charity number: 1112544
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £11.93k £1.13k £7.19k £11.75k £10.53k
Total expenditure £6.07k £4.51k £6.92k £12.94k £10.78k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A