THE FRIENDS OF SPU
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
- India
Governance
- 17 May 2006: Standard registration
- 09 August 2011: Removed (Does not operate)
- 09 August 2011: Removed (Does not operate)
No other names
Financial history
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2011 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2011 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2010 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2010 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2009 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2009 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2008 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2008 | Not submitted |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 18 APRIL 2006
Charitable objects
1 THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION IN INDIA, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY PROVIDING AND ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR EDUCATION AT SARDAR PATEL UNIVERSITY (SPU) IN VIDYANAGAR, GUJARAT, INDIA. 2 THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS, AND THE PRESERVATION AND PROTECTION OF HEALTH, INCLUDING THE SUPPORT OF MEDICAL RESEARCH AT SPU AND THE DISSEMINATION OF THE USEFUL RESULTS FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT.
Area of benefit
SARDAR PATEL UNIVERSITY (SPU) VIDYANAGAR, GUJARAT, INDIA
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window