GEOCOSMO RESEARCH CENTRE LTD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
earthquake precursors- earthquake pre-signals via satellites and ground stations.. Education, workshops, conferences, meetings, concerning earthquake precursors.. Project prepared by GeoCosmo Research Center, GeoCosmo ?nternational, GeoCosmo Science and GeoCosmo Research Centre with affiliated NASA Ames Research Center in California.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Other Charitable Purposes
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 19 December 2005: Standard registration
- METEOQUAKE RESEARCH CENTRE (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Friedemann Freund | Trustee | 04 June 2016 |
|
|
||||
Oliver Smyth | Trustee | 05 January 2016 |
|
|
||||
RONALD KAREL | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 25 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 10 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 18 August 2022 | 19 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 23 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 17 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED ON 2 SEPTEMBER 2005 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION 18 DECEMBER 2005 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 18/03/2015
Charitable objects
3. THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS ('THE OBJECTS') ARE: (A) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE SUBJECT OF EARTHQUAKE PREDICTION IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY THROUGH THE PROVISION OF SEMINARS, WORKSHOPS AND SPONSORING AND UNDERTAKING RESEARCH (WHERE POSSIBLE THE USEFUL RESULTS OF SUCH RESEARCH WILL BE PUBLISHED FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC); AND (B) TO PROTECT AND PRESERVE LIFE THROUGH SUPPORTING THE ESTABLISHMENT AND MAINTENANCE OF AN EARTHQUAKE EARLY WARNING SYSTEM.
Area of benefit
WORLDWIDE
Contact information
- Address:
-
7 MARSHE CLOSE
POTTERS BAR
EN6 5NR
- Phone:
- 01707643473
- Email:
- ronaldkarel@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window