GHANA YOUTH ASSOCIATION (GYA)
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
No activity done.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2013
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Accommodation/housing
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 15 March 2006: Standard registration
- 04 March 2014: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- GYA (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2009 | 31/03/2010 | 31/03/2011 | 31/03/2012 | 31/03/2013 | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2013 | 31 January 2014 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2013 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2012 | 20 March 2013 | 48 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2012 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2011 | 05 January 2012 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2011 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2010 | 19 January 2011 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2010 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 1 MARCH 2006
Charitable objects
THE BENEFIT OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE WHO ARE MEMBERS OF THE GHANAIAN AND OTHER WEST AFRICAN COMMUNITY IN THE UNITED KINGDOM, FOR: (A) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY THE PROVISION OF HOMEWORK CLUBS AND MENTORING SCHEMES; (B) THE RELIEF OF POVERTY, SICKNESS AND DISTRESS BY THE PROVISION OF INFORMATION, ADVICE AND ASSISTANCE REGARDING HEALTH, EMPLOYMENT, TRAINING, HOUSING IMMIGRATION, SOCIAL SECURITY AND ALLIED ISSUES; (C) THE PROVISION OR ASSISTANCE IN THE PROVISIONS, OF FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE INFIRMITY OR DISABILITY, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL CIRCUMSTANCES WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF THE SAID PERSONS.
Area of benefit
UNITED KINGDOM
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window