SALISBURY WOMEN'S REFUGE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Relief of stress and suffering experienced by women and their children who have been maltreated by their relatives, cohabitees, husbands or the fathers of their children.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £15,784 from 1 government contract(s)
People

5 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Accommodation/housing
- Children/young People
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Wiltshire
Governance
- 06 October 2006: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Caroline Probert | Chair | 23 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Alison Bradley | Trustee | 15 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Ann Cox | Trustee | 17 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Dragonetti | Trustee | 14 October 2020 |
|
|||||
CATRIONA FAY WOOD | Trustee | 13 June 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £170.23k | £199.88k | £198.53k | £206.15k | £207.31k | |
|
Total expenditure | £183.95k | £187.60k | £198.38k | £215.38k | £214.45k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | £64.55k | £69.53k | £62.60k | £15.78k | |
|
Income from government grants | £59.44k | £660 | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 06 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 06 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 08 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 08 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 13 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 13 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 03 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 03 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 22/11/2005 NOW ARTICLES ADOPTED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 12/04/2010
Charitable objects
3.1 TO RELIEVE DISTRESS AND SUFFERING EXPERIENCED BY WOMEN WHO HAVE BEEN MALTREATED BY THEIR RELATIVES, COHABITEES, HUSBANDS OR THE FATHERS OF THEIR CHILDREN; 3.2 TO RELIEVE DISTRESS AND SUFFERING AMONGST THE CHILDREN OF SUCH WOMEN; AND 3.3 TO RELIEVE THE NEED OF OTHER WOMEN AND CHILDREN IN NECESSITOUS CIRCUMSTANCES WHO ARE TEMPORARILY HOMELESS.
Area of benefit
SALISBURY, WILTSHIRE
Linked charities
- 06 October 2006 : Standard registration
Contact information
- Address:
-
ALEXANDRA HOUSE
ST JOHNS STREET
SALISBURY
WILTSHIRE
SP1 2SB
- Phone:
- 01722412412
- Email:
- office@swrefuge.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window