FRIENDS OF THE MEMORIAL HALL, WARWICK-ON-EDEN

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Our charity aims to keep the Village Hall open to the community and we are non profit making with all of monies recieved going to the running costs & any repair works needed to keep the hall in a safe condition for the public.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Disability
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Animals
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Cumbria
Governance
- 07 February 2006: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JANET PENNEY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JOCELYN MARY HOLLAND | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JUDITH ANGELA IRVING | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
GILLIAN WARD | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2019 | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £6.75k | £15.09k | £442 | £4.21k | £5.00k | |
|
Total expenditure | £10.71k | £5.94k | £2.09k | £4.57k | £5.32k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.30k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 21 August 2024 | 82 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 19 July 2023 | 49 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 19 July 2023 | 414 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 18 July 2023 | 778 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2019 | 20 April 2022 | 689 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED ON 11 JULY 2005 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 22 DECEMBER 2005
Charitable objects
3. OBJECTS THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ARE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC THE PROVISION AND MAINTENANCE OF A VILLAGE HALL FOR THE USE OF THE RESIDENTS OF THE VILLAGES OF WARWICK-ON-EDEN, AGLIONBY AND THE WIDER COMMUNITY WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, AGE, DISABILITY, NATIONALITY, RACE OR POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS, INCLUDING USE OF THE HALL FOR MEETINGS, LECTURES AND CLASSES OR OTHER FORMS OF RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID PERSONS.
Area of benefit
THE VILLAGES OF WARWICK-ON-EDEN, AGLIONBY AND THE WIDER COMMUNITY.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Eden Croft House
Warwick-On-Eden
CARLISLE
CA4 8PA
- Phone:
- 01228560376
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window