VICTORY HOUSING TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Registered Provider of Affordable Housing
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2019
Total income:
£34,874,000
Donations and legacies | £0 | |
Charitable activities | £28.06m | |
Other trading activities | £12.00k | |
Investments | £15.00k | |
Other | £6.79m |
Total expenditure:
£21,925,000
Raising funds | £0 | |
Charitable activities | £21.93m | |
Other | £0 |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Total income includes £1,758,000 from 2 government grant(s)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £0 | |
Charitable expenditure | £21.93m | |
Retained for future use | £12.95m |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Accommodation/housing
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Norfolk
Governance
- 03 February 2006: Standard registration
- 28 July 2020: Removed (Exempt charity)
- NNHT (Working name)
- NORTH NORFOLK HOUSING TRUST (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2015 | 31/03/2016 | 31/03/2017 | 31/03/2018 | 31/03/2019 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £28.29m | £29.86m | £29.90m | £32.68m | £28.07m | |
|
Total expenditure | £20.17m | £18.28m | £22.82m | £24.70m | £21.93m | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £1.64m | £540.00k | £861.00k | £1.04m | £1.76m | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £0 | £14.00k | £12.00k | £12.00k | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £23.42m | £23.94m | £24.57m | £25.73m | £28.06m | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £13.00k | £11.00k | £23.00k | £11.00k | £15.00k | |
|
Income - Other | £4.85m | £5.91m | £5.28m | £6.93m | £6.79m | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £20.04m | £18.28m | £22.82m | £24.70m | £21.93m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £126.00k | £132.00k | £153.00k | £151.00k | £151.00k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £214.00k | £167.00k | £106.00k | £112.00k | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/03/2015 | 31/03/2016 | 31/03/2017 | 31/03/2018 | 31/03/2019 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £111.57m | £137.79m | £147.86m | £161.54m | £172.32m | |
|
Long-term investments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Other assets | £5.07m | £7.70m | £13.46m | £5.79m | £8.55m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | -£1.47m | -£560.00k | -£1.84m | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £72.70m | £89.80m | £98.49m | £97.54m | £98.41m |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2019 | 06 September 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2019 | 06 September 2019 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2018 | 22 November 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2018 | 22 November 2018 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2017 | 14 December 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2017 | 14 December 2017 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 02/11/2004 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 21/06/2007 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 24/09/2009 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 13/02/2008 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 24/05/2012 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 17/01/2013 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 29 SEP 2016 as amended on 26 Nov 2018
Charitable objects
THE TRUST'S OBJECTS SHALL BE TO CARRY ON FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE COMMUNITY THE BUSINESS OF: 1) PROVIDING HOUSES, HOSTELS OR ANY OTHER HOUSING ACCOMMODATION AND ANY ASSOCIATED AMENITIES, SERVICES, ADVICE OR ASSISTANCE FOR PERSONS: (A) IN NECESSITOUS CIRCUMSTANCES UPON TERMS APPROPRIATE TO THEIR MEANS; (B) WHO ARE AGED, DISABLED (WHETHER MENTALLY OR PHYSICALLY), OR CHRONICALLY SICK, AND ARE IN NEED OF THE ACCOMMODATION OR OTHER BENEFITS PROVIDED BY VIRTUE OF THEIR CONDITION; (C) WHO ARE THEMSELVES IN NEED OF HOUSING IN ORDER THAT THEY MAY CARRY OUT CHARITABLE ACTIVITIES FOR THE BENEFIT OF OTHERS; (D) FOR ANY OTHER PERSON FOR WHOM IT WOULD BE CHARITABLE TO PROVIDE HOUSES, HOSTELS OR OTHER HOUSING ACCOMMODATION. 2) PROVIDING SERVICES, ADVICE OR ASSISTANCE UPON TERMS APPROPRIATE TO THEIR MEANS TO AGED, DISABLED (WHETHER MENTALLY OR PHYSICALLY) OR CHRONICALLY SICK PERSONS IN NEED THEREOF IN ARRANGING OR CARRYING OUT WORKS OF IMPROVEMENT REPAIR OR MAINTENANCE TO HOMES OCCUPIED BY THEM AND PROVIDING ANY ASSOCIATED AMENITIES SPECIALLY DESIGNED OR ADAPTED TO MEET THE DISABILITIES AND REQUIREMENTS OF SUCH PERSONS; 3) PROVIDING OR ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF INDIVIDUALS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABILITY, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL CIRCUMSTANCES WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE; 4) PROMOTING OR CARRYING OUT ANY OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSE THAT CAN BE CARRIED OUT BY A TRUST REGISTERED AS A SOCIAL LANDLORD WITH THE HOUSING CORPORATION.
Area of benefit
NORFOLK
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window