Accounts and annual returns AL- RAHMAT INTERNATIONAL TRUST, ARIT, THE MERCY INTERNATIONAL TRUST

Charity Number: 1112591
Charity reporting is overdue by 474 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 108 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 108 days
Annual return 31 March 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 474 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 474 days
Annual return 31 March 2022 06 May 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 13 April 2022 72 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 26 April 2022 450 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required