AL- RAHMAT INTERNATIONAL TRUST, ARIT, THE MERCY INTERNATIONAL TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
TO PROVIDE RELIEF TO THE DEPRIVED, AND SUFFERING AMONG VICTIMS OF NATURAL OR OTHER KINDS OF DISASTERS TO INHABITANTS OF PAKISTAN AND THE STATE OF KASHMIR. TO PROVIDE ACCESS TO CLEAN WATER, EDUCATION, HEALTHCARE, AND OTHER BASIC NEEDS. TO REDUCE POVERTY AND DEPRIVATION OF PAKISTANI AND KASHMIRI PEOPLE LIVING IN GREAT BRITAIN. TO BUILD PARTNERSHIPS & COLLABORATIONS WITH OTHER ORGANIZATIONS.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2022
People

4 Trustee(s)
3 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Accommodation/housing
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Recreation
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
- Afghanistan
- India
- Pakistan
- Turkey
Governance
- 22 December 2005: Standard registration
- AL-RAHMAT INTERNATIONAL TRUST (Working name)
- AL-RAHMAT INTERNATIONAL TRUST THE MERCY INTERNATIONAL TRUST (Working name)
- ARIT (Working name)
- THE MERCY INTERNATIONAL TRUST (Working name)
- AL- RAHMAT INTERNATIONAL TRUST ARIT THE MERCY INTERNATIONAL TRUST (Previous name)
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
BASHARAT ALI | Trustee | 25 December 2005 |
|
|
||||
MOHAMMED ASHFIQ | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
HABIB REHMAN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MOHAMMED AYUB | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2018 | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.79k | £8.92k | £5.40k | £24.20k | £21.38k | |
|
Total expenditure | £8.33k | £2.63k | £3.56k | £16.27k | £8.23k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 91 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 91 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 457 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 457 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 06 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 13 April 2022 | 72 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 26 April 2022 | 450 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 12 NOVEMBER 2005
Charitable objects
(1) TO PROVIDE RELIEF TO THE DEPRIVED, SUFFERING AMONG VICTIMS OF NATURAL OR OTHER KIND OF DISASTER TO INHABITANTS OF THE STATE OF KASHMIR. (2) TO REDUCE POVERTY AND DEPRIVATION OF KASHMIRI PEOPLE IN UK. (3) TO EDUCATE AND PROVIDE FACILITIES FOR RECREATION, YOUTH CENTRE AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF THE KASHMIRI COMMUNITY LIVING IN MANCHESTER AREA.
Area of benefit
THE STATE OF KASHMIR. THE UK AND THE MANCHESTER AREA
Contact information
- Address:
-
Al-Rahmat International Trust
19 Cheetham Hill Road
MANCHESTER
M4 4FY
- Phone:
- 0 161 29 82 786
- Email:
- info@alrahmat.org
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window