LBT GLOBAL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
PROVIDE CRITICAL & LOGISTICAL SUPPORT & GUIDANCE TO VICTIMS (& THEIR FAMILIES) OF SERIOUS INCIDENT AND TRAUMA OVERSEAS, INCLUDING, BUT NOT LIMITED TO, MISSING PERSONS, ALL DEATHS, ALL CRIMINAL ACTS, TERRORISM, DISASTER & OTHER SERIOUS INCIDENTS. PROVIDE SUPPORT, EVENTS, FACILITIES, TRAINING, SIGNPOSTING & MORE TO ENRICH & ENABLE PEOPLE IN TRAUMATIC CIRCUMSTANCES IN THE UK, LOCALLY & NATIONALLY.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
Total income includes £40,000 from 1 government grant(s)
People

5 Trustee(s)
12 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 28 February 2007: Standard registration
- THE LUCIE BLACKMAN TRUST (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Ali Noureldin Mohamed Anwar Khalil | Trustee | 20 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Catherine Ellen Owen | Trustee | 03 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
Claire Wendy Siobhan Borrett | Trustee | 03 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
OLIVER HALL | Trustee | 26 June 2012 |
|
|
||||
HEDLEY JOHN FINN OBE | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £225.22k | £135.28k | £160.92k | £205.75k | £57.30k | |
|
Total expenditure | £232.45k | £192.50k | £162.08k | £193.76k | £56.72k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £40.00k | £40.00k | £40.00k | £40.00k | £40.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 24 April 2025 | 78 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | 24 April 2025 | 78 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 28 February 2024 | 23 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | 28 February 2024 | 23 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 05 April 2023 | 59 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | 05 April 2023 | 59 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 04 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | 04 February 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 28 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | 28 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 28 APRIL 2006 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 12 OCTOBER 2006. as amended on 16 Oct 2020
Charitable objects
THE PROMOTION (IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND OVERSEAS) OF PUBLIC SAFETY AND THE PREVENTION OF CRIME IN PARTICULAR BY NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY PROVIDING GUIDANCE TO YOUNG PEOPLE IN THE USE OF ELECTRONIC COMMUNICATIONS AND OTHER MEDIA TO FACILITATE THE EXCHANGE OF INFORMATION AND EXPERIENCE OF MEMBERS IN THE AREA OF PERSONAL SAFETY.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED IN PRACTICE NATIONAL AND OVERSEAS
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Secret Garden
60-61 High Street
Brading
Sandown
PO36 0DQ
- Phone:
- 01983718802
- Email:
- matt@lbtrust.org
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window