ANAND MILAN CENTRE
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We run day centre for elderly people aged over 50+. We are a voluntary community registered charity which is non-profitable. Our all committee members (staff) are old, retired and volunteers. We provide healthy and nutritious hot meals including tea-time, some wonderful trips, some sessions like exercise sessions, body massaging sessions, yoga sessions, and arts & crafts sessions etc.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2023
Total income includes £12,998 from 2 government contract(s) and £12,998 from 2 government grant(s)
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Bradford City
Governance
- 07 December 2006: Standard registration
- 07 August 2024: Removed (Funds transferred (incor))
- 07 August 2024: Funds transferred to 1204261 ANAND MILAN ELDERLY CENTRE
- ANAND MILAN CENTRE BRADFORD (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £38.55k | £38.53k | £2.30k | £34.67k | £48.39k | |
|
Total expenditure | £46.04k | £52.65k | £2.81k | £41.31k | £49.04k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | £10.80k | £13.00k | |
|
Income from government grants | £12.36k | N/A | N/A | £10.80k | £13.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 28 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 28 November 2023 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 24 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 24 November 2022 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 21 March 2022 | 49 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 07 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 07 December 2020 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 13 NOVEMBER 2006.
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE RELIEF OF ELDERLY PEOPLE, IN PARTICULAR THE ELDERLY GUJARATI INDIAN IN ANY MANNER DEEMED BY LAW TO BE CHARITABLE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window