Financial history MOSELEY PARK AND POOL TRUST

Charity number: 1115870
Charity reporting is up to date (38 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £114.31k £159.72k £218.99k £140.56k £157.24k
Total expenditure £106.32k £156.64k £130.20k £159.55k £137.11k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £25.50k N/A N/A N/A