WISH FOR AFRICA
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We provide affordable healthcare by working with local partners to build primary healthcare centres in poor communities of Africa. We also help by subsidising the costs of treatments. We improve standards by encouraging volunteering and advocating for healthcare reforms. We raise awareness about the plight of Africans, the men, women and children who are daily enduring the hardship of poverty.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 May 2017
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Nigeria
Governance
- 08 May 2006: Standard registration
- 01 April 2021: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- WORLDWIDE INITIATIVES IN SUSTAINABLE HEALTHCARE FOR AFRICA (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/05/2013 | 31/05/2014 | 31/05/2015 | 31/05/2016 | 31/05/2017 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £496 | £496 | £240 | £100 | £1 | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.45k | £120 | £120 | £120 | £1 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2020 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2020 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2017 | 17 January 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2017 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 8 APRIL 2006
Charitable objects
THE PROMOTION AND PROTECTION OF GOOD HEALTH AND THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS AMONGST AFRICAN COMMUNITIES IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY: I) THE PROVISION OF GRANTS AND MICRO-FINANCE LOANS TO DOCTORS, NURSES, AND THE HEALTHCARE COMMUNITY IN GENERAL. II) THE PROVISION OF TRAINING AND GRANTS FOR RESEARCH INTO COMMUNITY HEALTHCARE; AND III) THE PROVISION OF MEDICAL FACILITIES AND PUBLIC/COMMUNITY HEALTH EDUCATION.
Area of benefit
AFRICA
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window