SOUTHWARK REFUGEE PROJECT LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Advice and Information Training Outreach Outings
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Accommodation/housing
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Croydon
- Greenwich
- Lambeth
- Lewisham
- Southwark
Governance
- 20 October 2006: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MANUEL MONADE NA | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Fatima Ryan | Trustee | 20 June 2014 |
|
|
||||
Yagoub Omar Abdullah | Trustee | 20 June 2014 |
|
|
||||
Oswaldo Armijos | Trustee | 20 June 2014 |
|
|
||||
PAUL STEWART | Trustee | 24 December 2012 |
|
|
||||
BEATRICE ATAKO | Trustee | 05 October 2011 |
|
|
||||
GRACE TETTEH | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MS E GEBREGZIABHER | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2018 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £11.65k | £13.57k | £151 | £138 | £80 | |
|
Total expenditure | £10.42k | £4.76k | £4.24k | £1.93k | £1.67k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 08 April 2025 | 67 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 08 April 2025 | 433 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 08 April 2025 | 798 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 08 April 2025 | 1163 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1551 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1551 days |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 14 MARCH 2005
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE FOR THE BENEFIT OF REFUGEES AND ASYLUM SEEKERS PRIMARILY WITHIN THE LONDON BOROUGH OF SOUTHWARK BUT ALSO WITHIN THE SURROUNDING BOROUGHS TO RELIEVE POVERTY, IMPROVE HEALTH, ADVANCE EDUCATION AND PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION OR LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF THE SAID PERSONS. SRP WILL PROVIDE SUCH PERSONS WITH FREE AND CONFIDENTIAL SERVICE, ASSISTANCE, REPRESENTATION, COUNSELLING, TRANSLATING AND INTERPRETING SERVICES IN MATTERS SUCH AS ASYLUM, IMMIGRATION, MONEY, DEBTS, WELFARE BENEFITS, HOUSING, HEALTH, EDUCATION, TRAINING AND EMPLOYMENT.
Area of benefit
LONDON BOROUGH OF SOUTHWARK AND SURROUNDING BOROUGHS
Contact information
- Address:
-
S R P
161 Sumner Road
London
SE15 6JL
- Phone:
- 02077034046
- Email:
- swkrefproj@aol.com
- Website:
-
southwarksrp.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window