ALINGTON HOUSE COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We target work with groups that face disadvantage including economic, social and educational disadvantages. We promote celebration of difference through single gender work, asylum seeker and refugee work, and other marginalised group work. We offer training to unemployed residents in the deprived Durham Coalfields area and work on an outreach basis to offer volunteering roles to those in need.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityOne or more of the employees were formerly trustees
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Disability
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Durham
Governance
- 27 March 2006: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DAVID GEORGE THURLWELL | Chair | 15 June 2011 |
|
|
||||
Adrian Richard Thurlwell | Trustee | 07 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Claire O'Boyle | Trustee | 07 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Michelle Lindsay-Baharie | Trustee | 14 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
John Lowe | Trustee | 15 January 2020 |
|
|||||
Alix Collingwood | Trustee | 16 August 2018 |
|
|
||||
Patricia Marie O'Boyle | Trustee | 12 June 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £122.70k | £96.87k | £120.00k | £104.87k | £143.07k | |
|
Total expenditure | £121.73k | £69.01k | £140.00k | £113.44k | £121.44k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | £3.72k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £54.18k | £54.00k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 10 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 23 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 26 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 26 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 03 November 2022 | 3 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 03 November 2022 | 3 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 03 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 03 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 01 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 07 August 2021 | 280 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 14/11/2005 NOW ARTICLES ADOPTED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 29/05/2013
Charitable objects
A) TO PROMOTE, SUPPORT AND ENCOURAGE VOLUNTARY, RECREATIONAL AND LEISURE ACTIVITIES DESIGNED TO ENHANCE THE SOCIAL, EDUCATIONAL, CULTURAL AND SPIRITUAL LIFE OF THE INHABITANTS OF DURHAM CITY AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD (THE 'AREA OF BENEFIT') B) TO ESTABLISH, MAINTAIN AND MANAGE A COMMUNITY CENTRE FOR ACTIVITIES PROMOTED BY THE ASSOCIATION, ITS CONSTITUENT BODIES AND THE INHABITANTS OF THE AREA OF BENEFIT, IN FURTHERANCE OF THE ABOVE OBJECT. C) IN CARRYING OUT THE ABOVE, TO RESIST DISCRIMINATION BASED ON AGE, GENDER, RACE, RELIGION, POLITICAL PERSUASION, SEXUAL ORIENTATION OR OTHER PERSONAL DIFFERENCES.
Area of benefit
DURHAM CITY AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD
Contact information
- Address:
-
ALINGTON HOUSE C. A.
ALINGTON HOUSE
4 NORTH BAILEY
DURHAM
DH1 3ET
- Phone:
- 01913864088
- Email:
- info.alingtonhouse@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window