THE HERMITAGE RIVERSIDE MEMORIAL APPEAL FUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To raise funds for the erection of a memorial sculpture and information panel on Hermitage Riverside Gardens, Wapping, London.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2018
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Throughout London
Governance
- 17 January 2006: Standard registration
- HRMA (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JEAN ROBERTA HOWLETT | Chair |
|
|
|||||
JEREMY PAUL TAYLOR | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2014 | 31/08/2015 | 31/08/2016 | 31/08/2017 | 31/08/2018 | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 312 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 312 days | |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 678 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 678 days | |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1043 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1043 days | |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1408 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1408 days | |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1773 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1773 days |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 4 NOVEMBER 2005.
Charitable objects
(A) TO PROMOTE GOOD CITIZENSHIP; (B) TO PROMOTE THE ENHANCEMENT AND IMPROVEMENT OF THE AREA OF BENEFIT (AS DEFINED BELOW) FOR THE BENEFIT OF ITS INHABITANTS; AND (C) TO ADVANCE ART AND EDUCATION FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC AND IN PARTICULAR BY CREATING AND DIRECTING A SCULPTURE IN THE NEIGHBOURHOOD OF WAPPING, EAST LONDON ('THE AREA OF BENEFIT') AND IN PARTICULAR BY CREATING AND ERECTING A SCULPTURE, AND ASSOCIATED INFORMATION PANELS, IN THE HERMITAGE RIVERSIDE MEMORIAL GARDEN, IN MEMORY OF CITIZENS KILLED IN THE SECOND WORLD WAR BOMBING OF THE HERMITAGE SITE, AND OTHER PARTS OF EAST LONDON..
Area of benefit
EAST LONDON
Contact information
- Address:
-
13 Pier Head
Wapping High Street
LONDON
E1W 1PN
- Phone:
- 02072654934
- Email:
- jeremyatwapping@msn.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window