Financial history THE EVAN CORNISH FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1112703
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023 05/04/2024
Total gross income £234.71k £171.50k £179.25k £211.94k £196.74k
Total expenditure £790.24k £1.42m £691.96k £1.05m £698.18k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A