YOUTH MENTORING IN ACTION
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
working with children, young people and families providing mentoring programs and community projects to support and improve the growth and development of vulnerable, disadvantaged or at risk children and young people in order to reassert a sense of hope in the future.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2021
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Barking And Dagenham
- Havering
- Redbridge
Governance
- 22 May 2006: Standard registration
- 12 April 2023: Removed (Does not operate)
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2017 | 31/03/2018 | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £722 | £1.25k | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £718 | £1.25k | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 31 March 2022 | 59 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2019 | 31 January 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 31 MARCH 2005 AS AMENDED AT A MEETING DATED 6 FEBRUARY 2006.
Charitable objects
(1) TO ADVANCE EDUCATION, PROVIDE LEISURE AND RECREATION FACILITIES AND OTHER PROGRAMMES IN THE INTEREST OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR YOUNG PEOPLE AGED 10 - 21 YEARS, BY PROVIDING AND MAINTAINING A SAFE AND SUPPORTIVE ENVIRONMENT AND VARIED PROGRAMMES OF YOUTHWORK, THROUGH WHICH YOUNG PEOPLE WHO ARE DEEMED VULNERABLE CAN IDENTIFY AND ADDRESS THEIR INDIVIDUAL AND COLLECTIVE NEEDS AND CONCERNS, AS WELL AS THOSE OF THE WIDER COMMUNITY THUS ENABLING YOUNG PEOPLE TO DEVELOP THEIR CONFIDENCE, SELF ESTEEM, SKILLS AND ABILITIES, IN ORDER THAT THEY MAKE INFORMED CHOICES, BECOME MORE CREATIVE AND MOVE TOWARDS FULFILLING THEIR POTENTIAL AND BECOME RESPONSIBLE MEMBERS OF THE COMMUNITY. (2) TO MAINTAIN AND ESTABLISH YOUTH PROJECTS WHETHER ALONE OR IN PARTNERSHIP WITH ANY OTHER BODY IN BARKING AND DAGENHAM, REDBRIDGE AND HAVERING.
Area of benefit
BARKING AND DAGENHAM, REDBRIDGE AND HAVERING.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window