THE SHOE ZONE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Trust makes grants and donations to other charities to relieve financial hardship and poverty and/or advancement of education, mainly for children and young persons under age 18 particularly in Leicestershire and Rutland and for certain charities in the Philippines and other countries.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income:
£754,288
Donations and legacies | £750.19k | |
Charitable activities | £0 | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £0 | |
Other | £4.10k |
Total expenditure:
£281,702
Raising funds | £0 | |
Charitable activities | £281.52k | |
Other | £184 |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £184 | |
Charitable expenditure | £281.52k | |
Retained for future use | £472.59k |
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 10 February 2006: Standard registration
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JOHN CHARLES PENNINGTON SMITH | Trustee |
|
||||||||
ANTHONY EDWARD PENNINGTON SMITH | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £264.00k | £161.92k | £319.87k | £671.87k | £754.29k | |
|
Total expenditure | £140.00k | £211.56k | £237.59k | £314.21k | £281.70k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | N/A | N/A | £670.73k | £750.19k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £4.10k | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | £314.21k | £281.52k | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £184 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Long-term investments | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Other assets | N/A | N/A | N/A | £811.00k | £1.28m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 24 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 24 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 08 January 2024 | 69 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 08 January 2024 | 69 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 27 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 27 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 29 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 29 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 13 November 2020 | 13 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 13 November 2020 | 13 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 1 NOVEMBER 2005.
Charitable objects
(A) THE TRUSTEES SHALL HOLD THE CAPITAL AND INCOME OF THE TRUST FUND UPON TRUST TO APPLY THE SAME AT SUCH TIME OR TIMES AS THEY MAY IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION THINK FIT FOR ALL OR ANY ONE OR MORE OF THE OBJECTS OF THE TRUST WHICH ARE MORE PARTICULARLY SET OUT IN SUB-CLAUSE (B) OF THIS CLAUSE (B) THE OBJECTS OF THE TRUST ("THE OBJECTS") SHALL BE TO RELIEVE FINANCIAL HARDSHIP AND POVERTY AND/OR ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND/OR OTHER PURPOSES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE COMMUNITIES OF LEICESTER LEICESTERSHIRE AND/OR RUTLAND AND (BUT WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING) TO PROVIDE ASSISTANCE TO CHILDREN AND YOUNG PERSONS AGED UNDER EIGHTEEN YEARS AND TO ASSIST WITH COMMUNITY ACTIVITIES WHICH ARE LIKELY TO HAVE AN EFFECT AND IMPACT ON A COMMUNITY OR A WIDE GROUP OF PEOPLE PROVIDED IN ALL CASES THAT SUCH PURPOSES ARE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES. (C) THE TRUSTEES MAY PAY OR APPLY THE CAPITAL AND INCOME OF THE TRUST FUND IN FURTHERANCE OF THE OBJECTS BY WAY OF GRANTS OR DIRECT PAYMENTS OR THE PAYMENT OF FEES FOR EDUCATION OR IN ANY MANNER WHATSOEVER AS THEY SHALL IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION THINK FIT.
Area of benefit
LEICESTER, LEICESTERSHIRE AND/OR RUTLAND
Contact information
- Address:
-
SHOE ZONE
HARAMEAD BUSINESS CENTRE
HUMBERSTONE ROAD
LEICESTER
LE1 2LH
- Phone:
- 01162223000
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window