Financial history GNOSALL & DISTRICT COMMUNITY FIRST RESPONDER GROUP

Charity Number: 1112651
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £35.77k £14.12k £17.40k £7.70k £8.11k
Total expenditure £16.11k £12.42k £17.08k £10.23k £14.56k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A