CHRONIC MYELOID LEUKAEMIA SUPPORT GROUP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We are an exclusively online support group, published and maintained by CML patients and carers. We provide advice, support and updated information regarding the current best available therapies and treatment options for CML patients in the UK, Europe and other regions. Access to our website is unrestricted. We welcome CML patients from all regions of the world.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 04 May 2006: Standard registration
- CML SUPPORT (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DAVID FITZGERALD | Chair | 04 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
Richard Stephen Willoughby | Trustee | 27 January 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £275 | £949 | £775 | £204 | £3.30k | |
|
Total expenditure | £19.57k | £2.13k | £543 | £565 | £456 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 13 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 30 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 30 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 28 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 29 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 18 JANUARY 2006
Charitable objects
TO PROTECT HEALTH AND RELIEVE THE SUFFERING OF THOSE DIAGNOSED WITH CHRONIC MYELOID LEUKAEMIA AND THOSE CARING FOR THEM BY PROVIDING INFORMATION, ADVICE AND SUCH SUPPORT AS NEEDED
Area of benefit
NATIONAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
4 Florence Mews
Ardleigh Road
LONDON
N1 4FA
- Phone:
- 07415798110
- Email:
- david@fitzg.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window